Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Felice Alberti d’Enno

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1701BornTrento
Apr 1726²24.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
6 Mar 175654.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
19 Jul 175654.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
19 Jul 175654.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
14 Nov 175655.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
7 Sep 175856.9SucceededBishop of Trento, Italy
31 Dec 176261.2DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Felice Alberti d’Enno:
Bishop Francesco Felice Alberti d’Enno (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288, and Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015