Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Vicariate Apostolic of Siberia | |||
1 December 1921 | Erected | Archdiocese of Mohilev | Vicariate Apostolic of Siberia (erected) |
Diocese of Vladivostok | |||
2 February 1923 | Elevated | Vicariate Apostolic of Siberia | Diocese of Vladivostok |
13 April 1991 | Suppressed | Diocese of Vladivostok (suppressed) | Apostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea} (erected) |
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Mar 2023 |
✠