Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Taunggyi

Archidioecesis Taunggyiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Matthias U Shwe, Archbishop
  • Basilio Athai, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 January 1998
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 26,850 (10,370 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, L-98 Bayintnaung Rd., Taunggyi 06011, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (081)21.689
  • Fax: 22.164

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Taunggyi
21 March 1961ErectedDiocese of Toungoo Diocese of Taunggyi (erected)
14 November 1988Territory LostDiocese of Taunggyi Diocese of Loikaw (erected)
Archdiocese of Taunggyi
17 January 1998ElevatedDiocese of Taunggyi Archdiocese of Taunggyi
15 December 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Taunggyi Diocese of Pekhon (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Taunggyi
197041,3731,455,5002.8%1310231,798209016ap1971
198057,0081,486,1793.8%2410341,6761912119ap1981
199031,7931,600,0002.0%184221,44588612ap1991
Archdiocese of Taunggyi
199940,8331,850,0002.2%313341,20079815ap2000
200043,2621,900,0002.3%4414596149815ap2001
200144,5541,950,0002.3%412431,03689816ap2002
200245,4741,709,9462.7%44347967812817ap2003
200346,4551,729,9452.7%484528932211818ap2004
200447,8861,736,8752.8%533568553312118ap2005
20057,3501,500,000.5%2142529427212bul15Dec2005
20107,3891,615,000.5%33336205427511ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011