Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Siping [Szepingkai]

Dioecesis Sepimchiaevensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Siping Shi, Liao-Pei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Szepingkai
2 August 1929ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Szepingkai (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Szepingkai [Siping]
1 June 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Szepingkai Vicariate Apostolic of Szepingkai [Siping]
Diocese of Siping [Szepingkai]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Szepingkai [Siping] Diocese of Siping [Szepingkai]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 9 Aug 2012