Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Brothers of the Sacred Heart

(Institute of Consecrated Life - Men)

Fratres a Sacratissimo Corde Iesu



Show: All | General Information | Leaders | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Members, Living | Affiliated Members, Deceased

Leader(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life - Men
  • Founded: 30 September 1821
  • Lay Religious Congregation
  • Mailing Address: Piazza Sacro Cuore, 3, 00151 Roma, Italia
  • Telephone: 06.58.23.31.29
  • Fax: 06.53.88.53

Past and Present Leaders



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
30 September 1821FoundedBrothers of the Sacred Heart
16 March 1891Decretum LaudisBrothers of the Sacred Heart
22 July 1894ApprobationBrothers of the Sacred Heart

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousHousesSource
2014281,107172ap2015
201720965156ap2018
202017916160ap2021


Affiliated Members, Living

Affiliated Members, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Annuario Pontificio, Year 2018, Page 1,420
  • Annuario Pontificio, Year 2021, Page 1,395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Mar 2023