Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Missionaries of the Immaculate Conception of Lourdes
Fathers of Garaison

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Congregatio Missionariorum Immaculatae Conceptionis B.M.V. (vulgo "de Lourdes")



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • Founded: 8 December 1848
  • Clerical Religious Congregation
  • Mailing Address: Maison des Chapelains, 1 Avenue Mgr Theas, 65100 Lourdes CEDEX, Francia
  • Telephone: 5.62.42.78.78

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
8 December 1848FoundedMissionaries of the Immaculate Conception of Lourdes
22 July 1868Decretum LaudisMissionaries of the Immaculate Conception of Lourdes
25 August 1876ApprobationMissionaries of the Immaculate Conception of Lourdes

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
201419274ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016