Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fratelli dell’Istruzione Cristiana di PloŽrmel

(Institute of Consecrated Life - Men)

Institutum Fratrum instructionis christianae de PloŽmel



Show: All | General Information | Leaders | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Members, Living | Affiliated Members, Deceased

Leader(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life - Men
  • Founded: 6 June 1819
  • Lay Religious Congregation
  • Mailing Address: Via della Divina Provvidenza, 44, 00166 Roma, Italia
  • Telephone: 06.66.41.56.18
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Leaders



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
6 June 1819FoundedFratelli dell’Istruzione Cristiana di PloŽrmel
7 January 1851Decretum LaudisFratelli dell’Istruzione Cristiana di PloŽrmel
13 March 1891ApprobationFratelli dell’Istruzione Cristiana di PloŽrmel

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousHousesSource
20202749123ap2021


Affiliated Members, Living

Affiliated Members, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Annuario Pontificio, Year 2021, Page 1,392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Mar 2023