Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Canons Regular of the Immaculate Conception

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Congregatio Canonicorum Regularium Immaculatae Conceptionis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • Founded: 21 November 1866
  • Order of Canons Regular
  • Mailing Address: Via Federico Torre, 21, 00152 Roma, Italia
  • Telephone: 06.580.64.96
  • Fax: 06.581.48.37

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
21 November 1866FoundedCanons Regular of the Immaculate Conception
8 April 1876Decretum LaudisCanons Regular of the Immaculate Conception
12 March 1887ApprobationCanons Regular of the Immaculate Conception

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
2013425018ap2014
2014414917ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016