Leader(s) |
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
24 November 1889 | Founded | Congregation of Christian Workers of Saint Joseph Calasanz | |
3 February 1926 | Decretum Laudis | Congregation of Christian Workers of Saint Joseph Calasanz | |
16 May 1939 | Approbation | Congregation of Christian Workers of Saint Joseph Calasanz |
Year | Religious Priests | Male Religious | Houses | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|
2014 | 20 | 32 | 6 | ap2015 |
2017 | 21 | 30 | 7 | ap2018 |
2020 | 21 | 29 | 7 | ap2021 |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Mar 2023 |
✠