Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Župan, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Nov 1578AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1 Feb 1579Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1581²DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franjo Župan
Bishop Franjo Župan O.F.M. Conv. (died 1581) Bishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZupa, Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)
Ordained BishopSan Francesco, Church, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 3
  • ob: CB, 9 Sep 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,543

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Sep 2020

Quantcast