Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo-Andrea Zottoli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1778³Born
7 Apr 180224.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 183860.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
17 Sep 183860.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
Oct 1838²60.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo-Andrea Zottoli
Bishop Angelo-Andrea Zottoli (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcerno

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,851, Page 78
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 73
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,838, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast