Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Giovanni Zorzi (Giorgi)

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1634³Born
Dec 165824.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
Dec 165824.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 166430.0AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
24 Jun 166430.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brescia, Italy
24 Oct 167844.3DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Giovanni Zorzi (Giorgi)
Bishop Marino Giovanni Zorzi (Giorgi) (born Jun 1634, died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained DeaconRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 39
  • b/od/op/ob: AT, 17 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018