Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Zorawski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1727³BornZawidzen
30 Nov 175124.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Płock, Poland
18 Dec 175124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
12 Jul 177951.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
12 Jul 177951.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
5 Jan 178254.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Zorawski:
Bishop Michael Zorawski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 30.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015