Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Georg Zobel von Giebelstadt

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹Born
20 Aug 157734.6SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
29 Jan 157835.0ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Sep 158037.6DiedBishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg Zobel von Giebelstadt (VIAF: 15569999)
Father Johann Georg Zobel von Giebelstadt (born 1543, died ) Bishop-Elect of Bamberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast