Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Zobel von Giebelstadt

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500²Born
16 Apr 154040.2Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
Aug 154444.5SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
27 Oct 154444.8ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
23 Aug 154545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
14 Apr 155858.2DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchior Zobel von Giebelstadt:
Bishop Melchior Zobel von Giebelstadt (died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2014
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 109
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015