Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Tomas Zerpa

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1823Born
1850¹26.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 187653.5AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
24 Mar 188663.0DiedPriest

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Tomas Zerpa
Father Tomas Zerpa (born , died ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Diocese of Mérida, Venezuela

  • a priest for 36.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 259
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017