Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Żelisławski, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateEventTitle
1557¹Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
18 Apr 1562SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 Oct 1562ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
8 Sep 1564Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
13 Apr 1571DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Żelisławski:
Bishop Stanisław Żelisławski O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 14.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013