Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Zebrzydowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹BornWięcborku
30 Mar 154347.2AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
8 Jun 154549.4AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
19 Mar 154650.2AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Feb 155155.1AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
23 May 156064.4DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Zebrzydowski:
Bishop Andrzej Zebrzydowski (died ) Bishop of Kraków

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 180
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 164, and Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013