Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Zauli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1743Born
178541.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181672.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
8 Mar 181672.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jul 181975.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Zauli (VIAF: 89057799)
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Zauli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Italy

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast