Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Zárate y Terán

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornMadrid
26 Oct 166050.8SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
21 Feb 166151.1ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
29 Jun 166151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
23 Oct 166353.8SelectedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
28 Jan 166454.0ConfirmedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
21 Dec 167969.9DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Zárate y Terán:
Bishop Francisco de Zárate y Terán (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,436
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159, and Page 310
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 194, Number 1,218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 1 Apr 2015