Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Zarceño Martínez, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1696BornColmenar de Oreja
14 Dec 173943.2AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
1740²43.2Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
23 Jan 174649.3DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Zarceño Martínez:
Bishop Francisco Zarceño Martínez O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a bishop for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013