Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sigismondo Zanettini

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1585AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
24 May 1589AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
1 Oct 1594DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Zanettini
Archbishop Sigismondo Zanettini (died ) Archbishop of Fermo

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Necrology (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018