Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gebhard von Zšhringen

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1050¹Born
1084²34.0AppointedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
21 Dec 108434.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 108434.9Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
12 Nov 111060.8DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gebhard von Zšhringen (VIAF: 89204371)
Bishop Gebhard von Zšhringen (born 1050, died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast