Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Zamudio y Avendaņo, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1570BornPortilla
10 Jul 162858.5AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
29 Jun 162959.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
27 Apr 163969.3DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Zamudio y Avendaņo:
Bishop Francisco de Zamudio y Avendaņo O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

  • a bishop for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,404
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 125
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014