Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Yue Fusheng

Bishop of Harbin [Harbin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1964³ Born
7 Aug 198824.3Ordained PriestPriest
1999²34.7SelectedBishop of Harbin [Harbin], China
16 May 201248.1SelectedBishop of Harbin [Harbin], China
6 Jul 201248.2Ordained BishopBishop of Harbin [Harbin], China
22 Sep 201854.4ConfirmedBishop of Harbin [Harbin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Yue Fusheng
Bishop Joseph Yue Fusheng (born Apr 1964) Bishop of Harbin [Harbin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorthern Hebei Province
Ordained BishopHarbin, Apostolic Administration of Harbin [Harbin]

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of Harbin [Harbin].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast