Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alfonso Yepes Rojo

Deceased

Prefect of Leticia, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1952Born
21 Nov 198028.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 198937.1AppointedPrefect of Leticia, Colombia
21 May 199038.3DiedPrefect of Leticia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Yepes Rojo
Father Alfonso Yepes Rojo (born , died ) Prefect of Leticia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonmatias

  • a priest for 9.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1990

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast