Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luc René Young Chen Yin, O.M.I.

Apostolic Administrator of Rodrigues, Mauritius

Priest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1960 Born
16 Feb 199231.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
4 Jan 202160.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rodrigues, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for Luc René Young Chen Yin
Father Luc René Young Chen Yin O.M.I. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Rodrigues

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ferme, Diocese of Port-Louis
Ordained PriestHong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Rodrigues.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: AM, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast