Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Yañez

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1543AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
20 Jan 1544Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
24 Dec 1544DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Yañez
Bishop Juan Yañez (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasas de Millán, Diocese of Plasencia
Ordained BishopToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 55, Number 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 145
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017