Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anthony Humilis Yang Guang-qi (Yang Kuang C’hi), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Yuci [Yütze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1912Born
9 Mar 194027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Sep 195542.7AppointedBishop of Yuci [Yütze], China
11 Nov 195744.9DiedBishop-Elect of Yuci [Yütze], China

MicroData Summary for Anthony Humilis Yang Guang-qi (Yang Kuang C’hi)
Father Anthony Humilis Yang Guang-qi (Yang Kuang C’hi) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Yuci [Yütze]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeng-tse-tsun
Death PlacePrison

  • a priest for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,955
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast