Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Bartolomeo Xerri

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1748³BornValletta, Malta
19 Sep 177224.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 182172.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
29 Sep 182173.0DiedArchbishop-Elect of Tyana

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bartolomeo Xerri
Father Giuseppe Bartolomeo Xerri (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Tyana

  • a priest for 49.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 382
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016