Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jerónimo Cardinal Xavierre, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546²BornZaragoza, Spain
28 Dec 156317.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
13 May 160155.3AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Dec 160761.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 160761.9ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Sep 160862.6DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Xavierre:
Jerónimo Cardinal Xavierre O.P. (died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1607
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 247, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015