Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Gerard Wyżycki

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1649³BornJazłowecen
29 May 169647.1SelectedBishop of Chełm, Poland
11 Apr 169950.0ConfirmedBishop of Chełm, Poland
5 Jan 170555.7DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Gerard Wyżycki:
Bishop Mikołaj Gerard Wyżycki (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156
  • b: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1699, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015