Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franciszek Ignacy Wysocki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1678BornZukowo
15 Apr 170223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa, Poland
14 Jun 172849.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
14 Jun 172849.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
14 Jul 172849.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Ignacy Wysocki:
Father Franciszek Ignacy Wysocki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 26.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015