Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus von Wolkenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1587BornBruck
8 Mar 161932.1AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
10 Sep 161932.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
7 Apr 162437.2DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus von Wolkenstein:
Bishop Nikolaus von Wolkenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a bishop for 4.5 years

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015