Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Wisbach, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Titular Bishop of Soldaja (Sudak)


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Oct 1480AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
6 Oct 1480AppointedTitular Bishop of Soldaja (Sudak)
28 Oct 1480Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soldaja (Sudak)

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Wisbach
Bishop Leonardo Wisbach O.P. , Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 240
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,480, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast