Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Patrick Joseph Whitney, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Ogoja

Superior General of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1894BornBreenletter, Co. Roscommon, Ireland
20 Jun 192025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
17 Mar 193237.6AppointedSuperior General of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
13 Mar 193843.6AppointedPrefect of Ogoja, Nigeria
May 1939³44.8ResignedPrefect of Ogoja, Nigeria
17 Jul 194248.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Ogoja, Nigeria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Whitney
Father Patrick Joseph Whitney S.P.S. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Ogoja

  • a priest for 22.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: CB, 20 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016