Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leo Joseph White

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Garissa, Kenya

Priest of Brooklyn, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1929Born
29 Jul 195627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Dec 197647.7AppointedPrefect of Garissa, Kenya
198454.7ResignedPrefect of Garissa, Kenya
1990²60.7IncardinatedPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
31 Jul 201889.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Garissa, Kenya

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo Joseph White
Father Leo Joseph White (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Garissa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChatham, Malta
Death PlaceSt. Bede, Church, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 62.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Aug 2018

Quantcast