Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Westfal

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1398Born
29 Oct 144951.8SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
16 Jan 145052.0ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
31 Jan 146668.0DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Arnold Westfal
Bishop Arnold Westfal (born 1398, died ) Bishop of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLübeck

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018