Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Konrad Wilhelm von Werdenau

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1638BornDettingen
21 Dec 168244.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
31 May 168344.8AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
5 Sep 168446.1DiedBishop-Elect of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad Wilhelm von Werdenau:
Priest Konrad Wilhelm von Werdenau (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Würzburg

  • a priest for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013