Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Balduin von Wenden, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1434AppointedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
27 Mar 1435Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
8 Jul 1441DiedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

MicroData Summary for Balduin von Wenden:
Archbishop Balduin von Wenden O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013