Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Weißenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1476SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
19 Jun 1476ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
1 Nov 1487DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Weißenbach
Bishop Johann von Weißenbach (died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,476, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast