Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Wardlaw

Deceased

Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1317¹Born
1367²50.0SelectedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Apr 136750.2ConfirmedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
23 Dec 138770.9DiedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walter Wardlaw
Bishop Walter Wardlaw (born 1317, died ) Bishop of Glasgow

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast