Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Burckhard von Warberg

Deceased

Bishop of Halberstadt, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1437SelectedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
19 Jul 1437ConfirmedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
14 Jan 1458DiedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Burckhard von Warberg
Bishop Burckhard von Warberg (died ) Bishop of Halberstadt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHelmstedt

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast