Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Wang

Deceased

Prefect of Chumatien [Zhumadian]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1890BornChumatien
31 Mar 191928.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 193342.6AppointedPrefect of Chumatien [Zhumadian], China
Aug 193948.6DiedPrefect of Chumatien [Zhumadian], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Wang:
Priest Peter Wang (born ) Prefect of Chumatien [Zhumadian]

  • a priest for 20.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013