Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederic de Wangen

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Aug 1207ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
27 Dec 1208³Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
6 Nov 1218DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frederic de Wangen
Bishop Frederic de Wangen (died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a bishop for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 497
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast