Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Waldby, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1386AppointedBishop of Aire, France
1387¹Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
14 Nov 1390AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
3 Nov 1395AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Chichester, England, Great Britain
5 Oct 1396AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
6 Jan 1398DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Waldby:
Archbishop Robert Waldby O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 243
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 108
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 187, and Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 229, and Page 72
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013