Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luke Wadding

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628²Born
26 Aug 167143.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ferns, Ireland
26 Aug 167143.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
23 Aug 167850.6SucceededBishop of Ferns, Ireland
20 Jun 1684³56.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
Dec 1691³63.9DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luke Wadding (VIAF: 8918134)
Bishop Luke Wadding (born 1628, died Dec 1691) Bishop of Ferns

  • a bishop for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 200, and Page 422
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 44
  • b: CB, 10 Mar 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,081
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast