Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Berthold von Wehingen

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1345Born
20 Sep 138136.7AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
Dec 138338.9Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
6 Feb 140459.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Freising, Germany
6 Feb 140459.1AppointedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
13 Jan 140661.0AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
13 Jan 140661.0ResignedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Sep 141065.7DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Berthold von Wehingen:
Archbishop Berthold von Wehingen (died ) Bishop of Freising

  • a bishop for 26.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 432, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013