Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Streitberg

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1421SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 Sep 1421ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Oct 1422Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Apr 1428DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Streitberg:
Bishop Johann von Streitberg (died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a bishop for 5.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016