Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Scherenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1401BornWürzburg
30 Apr 146665.3SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
20 Jun 146665.4ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
28 Sep 146665.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
29 Apr 149594.3DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Scherenberg:
Bishop Rudolf von Scherenberg (died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,483
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015